Lam, Buu-Khanh (CPSO#: 71258)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Mar 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Mar 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Vietnamese

Education:McGill University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street Room H3404a
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7293
Fax: 613 696-7118
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B-K Lam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Lam ( CPSO# 71258 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
H3404 - 40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-5001

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BUU-KHANH LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 11 Jul 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 12 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2003