Lam, Desmond Karman (CPSO#: 68206)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580 Ext. 6212
Fax: (416) 469-6874
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lam and Bodley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lam ( CPSO# 68206 )
Dr. J. Bodley ( CPSO# 68021 )

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
B730
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 323-2660

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
J6100
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6580

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DESMOND KARMAN LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999