Lam, Michael Yung Chee (CPSO#: 67785)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: Lam, Yung Chee (used until: 10 Aug 1994 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Y.C. Lam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lam ( CPSO# 67785 )

Business Address:
9 - 1170 Burhamthorpe Road West
Mississauga ON  L5C 4E6
Phone Number: (905) 281-9337

Medical Records Location

Address: c/o Dr, Asmat Khan 1170 Burnhamthorpe Road West Mississauga ON L5C 4E6
Date Received: 03 Nov 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL YUNG CHEE LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996