Lam, Patrick Wai Ming (CPSO#: 62524)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
88 Dancers Drive
Markham ON  L6C 2A5
Phone: (905) 947-9766
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit L7
280 West Beaver Creek Road
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3Z1
Canada
Phone: (905) 709-3690
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patrick Lam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Lam ( CPSO# 62524 )

Business Address:
Jubilee Square
280 West Beaver Creek Road
Suite L7
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3Z1
Phone Number: (416) 802-8060

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICK WAI MING LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1991