Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Lam, Sheung Lun Laurence (CPSO#: 52399)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:McMaster University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
NHS System
St Catharines General Site
1200 fourth ave.
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 684-7271 Ext. 45561
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Laurence Lam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lam ( CPSO# 52399 )

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
63 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 10 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHEUNG LUN LAURENCE LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1987