Lambert, Waide Thomas (CPSO#: 55665)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Sep 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Anaesthesia
Sudbury Regional Hospital Corp
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 671-5492
Fax: (705) 523-6269
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sorgini Eye Clinic
1351 Martindale Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 4J7
Canada
Phone: (705) 523-5555
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Barr Plastic Surgery Centre
205 Douglas Street,
Sudbury, Ontario
P3E 1E9
Sudbury ON  P3E 1E9
Canada
Phone: (705) 523-4900
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Northface Centre For Dental Surgery
2037 Long Lake Road, Unit A9
Sudbury, Ontario
P3E 6J9
Sudbury ON  P3E 6J9
Canada
Phone: 705-222-3223
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Waide T. Lambert Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 12 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Lambert ( CPSO# 55665 )

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 671-5492

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 06 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WAIDE THOMAS LAMBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAMBERT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1987