Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Landolt, Sandra Joy (CPSO#: 56806)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jan 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thornhill Dermatology Centre
Suite 302
1137 Centre Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 3M6
Phone: (905) 695-2020
Fax: (905) 695-3800
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Applewood Village Plaza
1077 North Service Rd
Unit 23 , Suite #210
Mississauga ON  L4Y 1A6
Canada
Phone: (905) 273-9009
Fax: (905) 273-6409
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 04 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDRA JOY LANDOLT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANDOLT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 1989