Lange-Mechlen, Ilse (CPSO#: 25721)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Oct 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Oct 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German, Latvian

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sherway Medical Clinic
190 Sherway Drive
Suite 102
Etobicoke ON  M0C5N2
Phone: 416-622-4762
Fax: 416-622-4163
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N2
Canada
Phone: (416) 622-4762
Fax: (416) 622-4763
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ILSE LANGE-MECHLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANGE-MECHLEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1973
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2005
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 06 Oct 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2006