Langley, John Hubert (CPSO#: 65355)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CAMH
80 Workman Way, room 5328
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 36473
Fax: (416) 979-4996
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John H. Langley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Langley ( CPSO# 65355 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Room 17-006, Cardinal Carter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-3084

Business Address:
Suite 5328
80 Workman Way
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Lady Dunn Health Centre Wawa
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN HUBERT LANGLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANGLEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1993