Langlois, David Allan (CPSO#: 72731)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Victoria Park Clinic
95 Darling Street
Brantford, Ontario
N3T 2K7
Brantford ON  N3T 2K7
Phone: (519) 720-0712
Fax: (519) 720-0713
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

14 John Street North
Hamilton, Ontario
L8R 1G9
Hamilton ON  L8R 1G9
Canada
Phone: (905) 546-0050
Fax: (905) 546-0030
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

1145 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2G 2N3
Canada
Phone: 519-579-0589
Fax: 519-579-6573
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

288 St. Paul Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 3M9
Canada
Phone: 905-684-9339
Fax: 905-684-2098
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David A. Langlois Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 10 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ALLAN LANGLOIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANGLOIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003