Lanius, Ruth Anne (CPSO#: 70520)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
P O Box 5339
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3306
Fax: (519) 663-3927
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Parkwood Institute
Arthur J Hobbins Bldg, Zone B Level
Room B2-155
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone: (519)685-4000 Ext. 42399
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ruth Lanius Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2003

Dr. R. Lanius ( CPSO# 70520 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre - University Hospita
Room C3-103
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3306

Business Address:
LHSC-Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
Suite A2-664
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 667-6550


Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. RUTH ANNE LANIUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANIUS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000