Larke, David Philip (CPSO#: 63765)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Larke Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Larke ( CPSO# 63765 )

Business Address:
2075 Hadwen Road
Mississauga ON  L5K 2L3
Phone Number: (905) 855-1860

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Business Address:
Cambridge Cardiac Care
150 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 6V6
Phone Number: (519) 624-3511

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID PHILIP LARKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LARKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1992