Larocque, Brian Joseph (CPSO#: 57154)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6100
Fax: (888) 678-3469
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Canada
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian Larocque Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Larocque ( CPSO# 57154 )

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Business Address:
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 646-6117

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN JOSEPH LAROCQUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAROCQUE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1988