Laslo, Britta Camilla Claire (CPSO#: 95372)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200 Terrace Hill St.
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: 519-751-5544
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

206 Locke St. South
Hamilton ON  L8P 4B4
Canada
Phone: (905) 570-0440
Fax: 905-570-0545
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

St. Peter's Hospital
88 Maplewood Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8M 1W9
Canada
Phone: (905) 777-3837
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Britta Laslo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Laslo ( CPSO# 95372 )

Business Address:
Locke St. Medical Clinic
206 Locke Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 4B4
Phone Number: (905) 570-0440

Business Address:
St. Peter's Hospital
88 Maplewood Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8M 1W9
Phone Number: (905) 777-3837

Business Address:
St. Peter's Residence
125 Redfern Avenue
Hamilton ON  L9C 7W9
Phone Number: (905) 388-0448

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation,St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jul 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRITTA CAMILLA CLAIRE LASLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LASLO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 20 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2013