Lata, Andrew Christopher (CPSO#: 32559)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Albany Medical Clinic
807 Broadview Ave
Toronto
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Phone: (416) 461-9471 Ext. 2370
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lata Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 07 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lata ( CPSO# 32559 )

Business Address:
Albany Medical Clinic
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Phone Number: (416) 461-9471

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 25 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW CHRISTOPHER LATA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LATA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1981