Lau, Ching (CPSO#: 53866)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2075 Bayview Ave H450
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4747
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ching Lau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lau ( CPSO# 53866 )

Business Address:
Room H450
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4747

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 27 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHING LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1985