Lau, Jenny (CPSO#: 97802)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Apr 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Apr 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
16-744, 610 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 5093
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jenny Lau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 11 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lau ( CPSO# 97802 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Suite 16-744
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNY LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 16 Dec 2014 to 12 Jan 2015
Elective Trainee - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2015