Lau, Wayne Chung-Wai (CPSO#: 71393)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1221 Bloor Street East
Mississauga ON  L4Y 2N8
Phone: (905) 625-1241
Fax: (905) 625-9514
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wayne Lau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Lau ( CPSO# 71393 )

Business Address:
1221 Bloor Street East
Mississauga ON  L4Y 2N8
Phone Number: (905) 625-1241

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WAYNE CHUNG-WAI LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1999