Laupacis, Andreas (CPSO#: 52445)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jan 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Li Ka Shing Knowledge Institute
St. Michael's Hospital 1st Floor
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5780
Fax: (416) 864-5117
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Laupacis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Laupacis ( CPSO# 52445 )

Business Address:
Li Ka Shing Knowledge Institute
St Michael's Hospital 1st Floor
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5780

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREAS LAUPACIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAUPACIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1986