Law, Marcus (CPSO#: 75211)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South East Toronto FHT
1871 Danforth Ave
Toronto ON  M4C 1J3
Phone: (416) 699-7775
Fax: (416) 699-7766
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marcus Law Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Law ( CPSO# 75211 )

Business Address:
South East Toronto FHT
1871 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 1J3
Phone Number: (416) 699-7775

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARCUS LAW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2002