Law, Samuel Fai (CPSO#: 68275)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:McGill University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
17th Floor Cardinal Carter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 2415
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samuel Law Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Law ( CPSO# 68275 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
17th Floor Cardinal Carter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMUEL FAI LAW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999