Lawless, Bernard Wayne (CPSO#: 68749)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
3-Queen-078
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5481
Fax: (416) 864-3083
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B.W. Lawless Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Lawless ( CPSO# 68749 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
3-Queen-073
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5481


Corporation Name: Ahmed Marshall Lawless Rizoli de Rezende-Neto Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rizoli ( CPSO# 64858 )
Dr. J. Marshall ( CPSO# 30263 )
Dr. B. Lawless ( CPSO# 68749 )
Dr. N. Ahmed ( CPSO# 73094 )
Dr. J. de Rezende-Neto ( CPSO# 99828 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
3-073 Donnelly Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5481

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 12 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BERNARD WAYNE LAWLESS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAWLESS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2001