Lawson, Margaret Lloyd (CPSO#: 60671)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-2411
Fax: (613) 738-4215
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Margaret Lawson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 9 2009

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 02 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGARET LLOYD LAWSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAWSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1990