Lazar, Cynthia Anne (CPSO#: 55771)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Aug 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
489 College Street
Toronto ON  M6G 1A5
Phone: (416) 929-1816 Ext. 124
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cynthia Lazar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lazar ( CPSO# 55771 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
489 College Street
Toronto ON  M6G 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 929-1816

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 08 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CYNTHIA ANNE LAZAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAZAR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Sep 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1987