Le, Khoa Anh (CPSO#: 68868)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Dec 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Dec 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Vietnamese

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church St
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7000
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Khoa Le Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Le ( CPSO# 68868 )

Business Address:
41 Stollery Pond Crescent
Markham ON  L6C 0V1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KHOA ANH LE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 1999