Le Saux, Nicole Marie Anne (CPSO#: 50924)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jan 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jan 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern
Ontario
Division of Infectious Diseases
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Fax: (613) 738-4832
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Farmer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Le Saux ( CPSO# 50924 )
Dr. J. Farmer ( CPSO# 50523 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Johnson Eye Care Centre
166 Brock Centre
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400


Corporation Name: N. Le Saux Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Le Saux ( CPSO# 50924 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern
Ontario
Division of Infectious Diseases
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 07 Sep 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLE MARIE ANNE LE SAUX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LE SAUX is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1988