Le, Tien Dung (CPSO#: 60948)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Feb 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Feb 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa General Hospital
Room 8168
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8560
Fax: (613) 737-8828
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tien Le Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Le ( CPSO# 60948 )

Business Address:
Ottawa General Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Room 8168
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8560

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIEN DUNG LE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Aug 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 1996
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Nov 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2002