LeBlanc, Claire Marie Anne (CPSO#: 56105)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jan 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montreal Childrens Hospital
Room A04.6118
1001 Decarie Blvd
Montreal QC  H4A 3J1
Phone: (514) 412-4268
Fax: (514) 412-4365

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 11 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLAIRE MARIE ANNE LEBLANC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEBLANC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Sep 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 1988