LeBlanc, Patricia Nicole (CPSO#: 92777)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 6201
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charles-Antoine Breau and P. Nicole LeBlanc Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. P. LeBlanc ( CPSO# 92777 )
Dr. C. Breau ( CPSO# 93732 )

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621


Corporation Name: P. Nicole LeBlanc Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 26 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA NICOLE LEBLANC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEBLANC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2012