Lebner, Adrianne Clara (CPSO#: 98052)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Palliative Care Program
596 Davis Dr., Newmarket ON
L3Y 2P9
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: 905-895-4521 Ext. 6080
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lebner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lebner ( CPSO# 98052 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Palliative Care Program
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (416) 660-0107

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADRIANNE CLARA LEBNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEBNER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2014