Lee, Allan (CPSO#: 76447)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health Centre
Etobicoke Campus - ER Department
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Allan Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lee ( CPSO# 76447 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health Center
Etobicoke Campus ER Department
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLAN LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2003