Lee, Donald Heaton (CPSO#: 50912)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus/Dept Of Radiology
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3203
Fax: (519) 663-8803
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Stratford General Hospital
Huron Perth Health Alliance
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Canada
Phone: (519) 272-8210
County: County of Perth
Electoral District: 02

Chatham Kent Health Alliance
519 King Street West
Chatham ON  N7M 1G8
Canada
Phone: (519) 436-1090
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01

89 Norman St
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Canada
Phone: (519) 464-4400
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Donald H. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lee ( CPSO# 50912 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Radiology
399 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5


Corporation Name: Lee Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 20 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Joseph's Health Services,Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 12 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONALD HEATON LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1984