Lee, Dong Byeck (CPSO#: 22691)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:Seoul National University, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. B. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 23 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 1966
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Feb 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jan 2012