Lee, Douglas Sang Yun (CPSO#: 68109)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room NU 4-482
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3861
Fax: (416) 340-3036
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Inst for Clinical Eval Sciences
Rm G-106, 2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Douglas Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lee ( CPSO# 68109 )

Business Address:
Room NU, 4-482
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3861

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 14 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS SANG YUN LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1998