Lee, Elmer Chia Chang (CPSO#: 70124)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medicine
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7545
Fax: (905) 804-7955
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Diabetes Management Centre
Trillium Health Partners - MH Site
Clinical & Admin Bldg, 2nd Floor
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: (905) 848-7545
Fax: (905) 804-7955
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Endocrinology Clinic
Trillium Health Partners - QHC Site
2nd Floor Medical Clinics
150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 1A5
Canada
Phone: (416) 521-4196
Fax: (416) 521-4082
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

101 Queensway West, Suite 401A
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Canada
Phone: (905) 272-9232
Fax: (905) 272-8984
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 May 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 10 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELMER CHIA CHANG LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2002