Lee, Joseph Yo-Sup (CPSO#: 65496)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
NewLife Fertility Centre
4250 Sherwoodtowne Blvd
Mississauga ON  L4Z 2G6
Phone: (905) 896-7100 Ext. 132
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

NewLife Fertility Centre
Unit 210
2 Dewside Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 0X5
Canada
Phone: (905) 896-7100
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lee ( CPSO# 65496 )

Business Address:
4250 Sherwoodtowne Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L4Z 2G6
Phone Number: (905) 896-7100

Business Address:
210 - 2 Dewside Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 3Y5

Business Address:
103 - 7777 Kipling Avenue
Vaughan ON  L4L 2Z3

Business Address:
8 - 670 Hwy 7
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P2

Business Address:
200 - 470 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 2X6

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH YO-SUP LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1997
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2012