Lee, Julia (CPSO#: 77954)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Nov 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
220 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9A 0A7
Phone: 416-626-2138
Fax: 416-620-7667
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: 905-494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Julia Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 02 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lee ( CPSO# 77954 )

Business Address:
106 - 499 Main Street South
Brampton ON  L6Y 1N7
Phone Number: (905) 796-6570

Business Address:
220 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9A 0A7
Phone Number: (416) 626-2138

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 484-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site Chesley
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIA LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2004