Lee, Julietta Chee Ting (CPSO#: 64751)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Dec 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jan 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1371 Neilson Road
Suite 319
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone: (416) 284-7227
Fax: (416) 284-7102
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kam-Tong Yeung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lee ( CPSO# 64751 )
Dr. K. Yeung ( CPSO# 66084 )

Business Address:
4B - 4773 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2N 0G2
Phone Number: (647) 348-2218

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 15 Feb 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIETTA CHEE TING LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 25 Nov 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 15 Feb 1998
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1996