Lee, Mark Kumho (CPSO#: 70574)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Sep 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7600
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lee ( CPSO# 70574 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK KUMHO LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1998