Lee, Mary Ching Yu (CPSO#: 64051)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin, Portuguese

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
340 College Street
Suite 220
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone: (416) 323-9440 Ext. 226
Fax: (416) 323-9545
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

UHN - Western Division
399 Bathurst Street
1st Floor
New East Wing
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-9440 Ext. 226
Fax: (416) 323-9545
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mary C. Y. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lee ( CPSO# 64051 )

Business Address:
340 College Street
Suite 220
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 323-9440

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 23 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY CHING YU LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 23 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1992