Lee, Patricia Pui Shuen (CPSO#: 82535)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
2304 Islington Avenue
Toronto ON  M9W 3W9
Phone: (647) 348-0588
Fax: (647) 348-5807
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Health Plus Multispecialty Medical
Clinic
Suite 3
640 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5R 3V2
Canada
Phone: (905) 268-0520
Fax: (905) 268-0521
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patricia Pui Shuen Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Lee ( CPSO# 82535 )

Business Address:
Health Plus Multispecialty Medical Clinic
Suite 3
640 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5R 3V2
Phone Number: (905) 268-0520

Business Address:
Unit 201
2304 Islington Avenue
Toronto ON  M9W 3W9
Phone Number: (647) 348-0588

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA PUI SHUEN LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 05 Feb 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 06 Feb 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 16 Apr 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 Apr 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2011