Lee, Peter Kwok On (CPSO#: 60138)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
99 Kakulu Road
Suite 212
Kanata ON  K2L 3C8
Phone: (613) 599-4452
Fax: (613) 599-6413
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter K O Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 20 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Lee ( CPSO# 60138 )

Business Address:
212 - 99 Kakulu Road
Kanata ON  K2L 3C8
Phone Number: (613) 599-4452

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 04 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology Effective: 21 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER KWOK ON LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1988