Lee, Shoo Kim (CPSO#: 56665)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Dec 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Dec 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Univ of Singapore, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 19-213D
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 6370
Fax: (416) 586-8745
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shoo Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 26 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lee ( CPSO# 56665 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 19-213D
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-8745

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 05 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHOO KIM LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 May 1986 to 30 Jun 1986
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 16 Jan 1989 to 12 Mar 1989
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 May 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Mar 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2008