Lee, Simon K (CPSO#: 59270)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Apr 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Apr 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2
160 East Beaver Creek Road
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3L4
Phone: (905) 886-7546
Fax: (905) 886-7576
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Simon K. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lee ( CPSO# 59270 )

Business Address:
2 - 160 East Beaver Creek Road
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3L4
Phone Number: (905) 886-7546

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIMON K LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 1988