Lee-Poy, Michael Frank (CPSO#: 78998)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Dec 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Centre for Family Medicine
10-B Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2G 1C5
Phone: (519) 783-0022
Fax: (519) 783-0032
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

25 Joseph Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 4X6
Canada
Phone: (519) 578-2100
Fax: (519) 578-2109
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Lee-Poy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lee-Poy ( CPSO# 78998 )

Business Address:
The Centre for Family Medicine
25 Joseph Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 4X8
Phone Number: (519) 578-2100

Business Address:
Centre for Family Medicine
10B Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2G 1C5
Phone Number: (519) 783-0022

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL FRANK LEE-POY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE-POY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2005