Leech, Judith Anne (CPSO#: 57086)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Civic Hospital
Pulmonary Division
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4636
Fax: (613) 761-5333
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

West Ottawa Sleep Centre
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Canada
Phone: (613) 722-9900
Fax: (613) 722-9100
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Judith Leech Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Leech ( CPSO# 57086 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Civic Hospital
Pulmonary Division
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4636

Business Address:
West Ottawa Sleep Centre
303 - 770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 722-9900

Business Address:
Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 432-8259

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut
Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 28 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUDITH ANNE LEECH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEECH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1986