Lega, Iliana Carolina (CPSO#: 92255)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Nov 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Nov 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Romanian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
6th floor
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6013
Fax: (416) 323-6534
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. I. Lega Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Lega ( CPSO# 92255 )

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
6th Floor
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6013

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 15 Nov 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ILIANA CAROLINA LEGA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEGA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2009