Leis, Jerome Allen (CPSO#: 88653)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room B103
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-6100 Ext. 7249
Fax: 416-480-4786
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jerome Leis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Leis ( CPSO# 88653 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room H463
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6737

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Jul 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEROME ALLEN LEIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2012