Leitch, Khristinn Kellie (CPSO#: 68310)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Sep 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Sep 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 135
Wellington Street
Ottawa ON  K1A 0A6
Phone: (647) 992-5355
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Khristinn Kellie Leitch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Leitch ( CPSO# 68310 )

Business Address:
904 - 180 York Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 1J8
Phone Number: (647) 992-5355

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KHRISTINN KELLIE LEITCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEITCH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2002