Lem, Selina Lisa (CPSO#: 73949)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1
2630 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4B9
Phone: (416) 748-8434
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

65 Donly Drive North, Unit 6
Simcoe ON  N3Y 0C2
Canada
Phone: (519) 426-5068
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04

Unit B23
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Canada
Phone: (416) 741-2766
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 121
2291 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke ON  M9W 4L6
Canada
Phone: (416) 244-8862
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Unit 18
826 King St. North
Waterloo ON  N2J 4G8
Canada
Phone: 5192067777
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Unit 102
704 Mara St.
Point Edward ON  N7V 1X4
Canada
Phone: 5194918377
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01

Unit 105
189 Kent St W
Lindsay ON  K9V 2Y8
Canada
Phone: 7053282400
County: County of Victoria
Electoral District: 06

Unit 56
2700 Dufferin St
Toronto ON  M6B 4J3
Canada
Phone: 4167826333
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 1A
3585 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1G 1P4
Canada
Phone: (416) 431-0736
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

40 Westmore Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4C2
Canada
Phone: (416) 745-8429
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Unit B104
7155 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Canada
Phone: (416) 628-7710
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Unit 10
78 Corporate Drive
Scarborough ON  M1H 3G4
Canada
Phone: (416) 279-0855
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

586 Eglinton Ave E, #104
Toronto ON  M4P 1P2
Canada
Phone: (416) 485-9471
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

10 Unionville Gate, #204
Unionville ON  L3R 0W7
Canada
Phone: (905) 479-3945
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Lem Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lem ( CPSO# 73949 )

Business Address:
Unit 6
65 Donly Drive North
Simcoe ON  N3Y 0C2
Phone Number: (519) 426-5068

Business Address:
40 Westmore Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4C2
Phone Number: (416) 745-8429

Business Address:
Suite B 23
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Phone Number: (416) 741-2766

Business Address:
Suite B104
7155 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Phone Number: (416) 628-7710

Business Address:
200 St. Clair Avenue West
Toronto ON  M4V 1R1
Phone Number: (416) 923-5148

Business Address:
4129 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1E 2S2
Phone Number: (416) 439-1991

Business Address:
Suite 10
78 Corporation Drive
Scarborough ON  M1H 3G4
Phone Number: (416) 279-0855

Business Address:
Suite 203
101 Westmore Drive
Toronto ON  M9V 4C2
Phone Number: (416) 745-0500

Business Address:
Suite 104
586 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 1P2
Phone Number: (416) 485-9471

Business Address:
Suite 204
10 Unionville Gate
Unionville ON  L3R 0W7
Phone Number: (905) 479-3945

Business Address:
Humber Valley Xray and Ultrasound
Suite 1
2630 Kipling Avenue
Rexdale ON  M9V 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 748-8434

Business Address:
Markham-Lawrence Xray and Ultrasound
Unit 1A
3585 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1G 1P4
Phone Number: (416) 431-1889

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SELINA LISA LEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 12 Apr 2006
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004